IN HB1226 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Law 120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-14 - Public Law 120
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Solid waste matters. Establishes the central Indiana waste diversion pilot project (pilot project). Requires the department of environmental management to: (1) develop pilot project application forms; (2) make the forms available on or before July 1, 2022; (3) accept applications through October 1, 2022; and (4) provide recommendations to the Indiana recycling market development board (board) on or before December 1, 2022. Requires the board to award not more than $4,000,000 in total to applicants chosen to participate in the pilot project. Limits the pilot project to Marion County. Amends the definition of "solid waste"to exclude materials that are used in creating a product and that meet other conditions. Provides that: (1) a transfer station or treatment, storage, or disposal facility that holds a permit to handle hazardous waste may also handle solid waste; (2) solid waste that is managed at a transfer station or a treatment, storage, or disposal facility shall not be allowed to come into direct contact with hazardous waste, and any solid waste that does come into direct contact with hazardous waste shall then be managed as hazardous waste; and (3) the environmental rules board (rules board) shall amend 329 IAC 11 to conform to these provisions. Requires the rules board to expeditiously adopt by rule all waste regulation exemptions or exclusions as that are adopted by the United States Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) and set forth in the federal rule on the identification and listing of hazardous waste. Provides that until certain federal rule amendments that were adopted by the EPA on May 30, 2018, are adopted by the rules board, those amendments apply to the identification and listing of hazardous waste in Indiana just as if the amendments were already incorporated by reference into the rules of the rule board on the identification and listing of hazardous waste. Provides that: (1) the disposal of non-hazardous coal mining waste and coal combustion residuals at a surface coal mining facility; and (2) the use of coal combustion residuals as raw material for manufacturing another product or for eight other particular uses; are not subject to regulation under the solid waste rules. Makes corresponding changes.
Title
Solid waste matters.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Speedy [R] | Rep. Carey Hamilton [D] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 78 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Public Law 120 |
2022-03-14 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 340: yeas 78, nays 8 |
2022-03-03 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senator Garten added as second sponsor |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 297: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Representative Hamilton added as coauthor |
2022-01-31 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Messmer |
2022-01-31 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 143: yeas 90, nays 0 |
2022-01-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs |
2022-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Speedy |