IN HB1224 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Representative Heaton added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-31 - Representative Heaton added as coauthor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Government investments and contracts. Provides that the state or the Indiana public retirement system may not make certain investments in companies that boycott energy companies or companies that do business with energy companies. Provides that a state agency may not enter into a contract with certain companies for the purchase of supplies or services unless the contract contains a written verification from the company that the company does not boycott energy companies and will not boycott energy companies during the term of the contract.
Title
Government investments and contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-31 | House | Representative Heaton added as coauthor |
2022-01-27 | House | Amendment #2 (Manning) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-27 | House | Amendment #1 (Manning) prevailed; voice vote |
2022-01-27 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2022-01-25 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-10 | House | Reassigned to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance |
2022-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2022-01-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative Soliday |
2022-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Manning |