IN HB1224 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Public Law 104
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

School intergenerational safety pilot project. Establishes the school intergenerational safety pilot project (project) to foster positive youth development through intergenerational relationships between individuals who are at least 55 years of age and students and to improve school safety. Provides that the project expires July 1, 2021. Provides that a school corporation selected by the department of education is eligible to receive a grant from the Indiana safe schools fund to administer the project.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School intergenerational safety pilot project. Establishes the school intergenerational safety pilot project (project) to foster positive youth development through intergenerational relationships between individuals who are at least 55 years of age and students and to improve school safety. Provides that the project expires July 1, 2021. Provides that a school corporation selected by the department of education is eligible to receive a grant from the Indiana safe schools fund to administer the project.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HousePublic Law 104
2019-04-25HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 460: yeas 93, nays 0
2019-04-08HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-03-28SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-26SenateSenator Rogers added as cosponsor
2019-03-26SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 323: yeas 46, nays 2
2019-03-25SenateAmendment #1 (Melton) failed; voice vote
2019-03-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenator Raatz added as second sponsor
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-18HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Kruse
2019-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 190: yeas 98, nays 0
2019-02-14HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-29HouseRepresentatives Cook, Manning, DeLaney added as coauthors
2019-01-24HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-01-24HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Goodrich

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1224/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/8/0/6/a8069ace/HB1224.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/a/8/0/7a80f83b/HB1224.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/c/5/e/9c5e2efb/HB1224.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/8/6/b586b8ea/HB1224.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/7/0/5d701aec/HB1224.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/2/e/552e77ae/HB1224.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/7/f/8/b7f8763f/HB1224.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/5/5/2355fe2c/HB1224.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/e/0/e2e0f196/HB1224.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/8/6/4/58642fdf/HB1224.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/d/8/9ed86d04/HB1224.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/7/e/d/67ede932/HB1224.190.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/1/6/2/e162ef37/HB1224.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/a/a/b8aa048e/HB1224.323.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/3/d/123df5b5/HB1224.460.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback