IN HB1224 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that after June 30, 2012, if a school speed zone has been established for a school that operates on a 12 month schedule, in order for the speed limit to be valid there must be a school zone sign indicating that the school is an all year school.
Title
Speed zones for all year schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Gregory Porter [D] | Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D] | Rep. Mike Speedy [R] |
Rep. Dennis Tyler [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 52 | |
2011-04-20 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-04-15 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-13 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-12 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-11 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2011-04-11 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 332: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2011-04-07 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-05 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-22 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs | |
2011-02-21 | Senate sponsors: Senators Merritt and Breaux | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-02-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 98, nays 0 | |
2011-02-17 | Representative Porter added as coauthor | |
2011-02-17 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-15 | Representatives Tyler and Morris added as coauthors | |
2011-02-14 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-31 | Representative Speedy added as coauthor | |
2011-01-12 | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation | |
2011-01-12 | Authored by Representative Pryor |