IN HB1223 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Senate sponsor: Senator Walker K
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Education matters. Requires that the Indiana family friendly school designation program of the department of education (department) establish a procedure under which the department must conduct an assessment for the purpose of evaluating and improving parent involvement in the school if the parents of at least 10% of the students currently included in the average daily membership (ADM) at a particular school request an assessment. Requires that the department determine the manner in which requests may be submitted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-27HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Walker K
2022-01-27HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 123: yeas 95, nays 0
2022-01-24HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2022-01-20HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2022-01-06HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2022-01-06HouseCoauthored by Representatives Cook, Clere, DeLaney
2022-01-06HouseAuthored by Representative Davisson J.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2022/bills/house/1223/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/1/9/c019bf82/HB1223.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/1/c/1b1c62d7/HB1223.02.COMH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/e/c/88ec4f15/HB1223.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/d/7/b/fd7bca5e/HB1223.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/e/c/86ec8a96/HB1223.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/1/8/1118ec1d/HB1223.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/5/a/655a1148/HB1223.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/4/6/d/a46de5fb/HB1223.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/5/1/b5519558/HB1223.123_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback