IN HB1223 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Public Law 205
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Administrative law judges. Establishes the office of administrative law proceedings (office) within the state personnel department to hear certain administrative proceedings that result in a finding of fact determining the legal rights, duties, or privileges of a party after an opportunity for an evidentiary hearing. Specifies the administrative proceedings over which the office has jurisdiction. Provides a list of agencies over whose administrative proceedings the administrative law judges from the office do not preside. Provides that the office shall have a director who is responsible for administering the office, hiring administrative law judges, and assigning administrative law judges to administrative proceedings. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative law judges. Establishes the office of administrative law proceedings (office) within the state personnel department to hear certain administrative proceedings that result in a finding of fact determining the legal rights, duties, or privileges of a party after an opportunity for an evidentiary hearing. Specifies the administrative proceedings over which the office has jurisdiction. Provides a list of agencies over whose administrative proceedings the administrative law judges from the office do not preside. Provides that the office shall have a director who is responsible for administering the office, hiring administrative law judges, and assigning administrative law judges to administrative proceedings. Makes conforming amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HousePublic Law 205
2019-05-02HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-17HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 546: yeas 92, nays 0
2019-04-17HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-09SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-08SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 402: yeas 49, nays 0
2019-04-04SenateAmendment #6 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-04SenateAmendment #3 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-04SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-03-21SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-18HouseCosponsor: Senator Taylor G
2019-02-18HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Head, Koch and Freeman
2019-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 189: yeas 97, nays 0
2019-02-14HouseAmendment #1 (Steuerwald) prevailed; voice vote
2019-02-14HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-02-11HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2019-01-10HouseCoauthored by Representatives Bosma, Borders and DeLaney
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Steuerwald

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1223/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/4/3/8d43089a/HB1223.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/b/5/b/0b5bfff3/HB1223.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/4/8/33481a2d/HB1223.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/f/4/77f48e0d/HB1223.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/1/2/f4122817/HB1223.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/5/6/0/3560f3d6/HB1223.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/b/3/8/9b38aeb5/HB1223.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/2/a/ab2a22da/HB1223.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/b/f/5abfc243/HB1223.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/7/7/9677fb85/HB1223.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/0/0/6900b085/HB1223.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/e/8/b/2e8bc552/HB1223.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/f/e/7ffeced1/HB1223.189.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/3/8/76385537/HB1223.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/c/e/5/0ce59bbf/HB1223.402.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/b/2/33b2902a/HB1223.546.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback