IN HB1222 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Representative Boy added as conferee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Miscellaneous election law matters. Allows an individual who is an unopposed candidate for township office to be appointed and serve as a precinct election officer at any vote center if certain conditions are met. Abolishes city and town conventions for nomination of candidates for municipal offices, beginning January 1, 2021. Abolishes town election boards. Provides that a local public question may not be placed on the ballot in a year after a presidential election year. Provides that a school referendum tax levy or a school safety referendum tax levy may be reimposed or extended in 2021, 2025, or 2027 if the school corporation would have been permitted to reimpose or extend the levy under statutes as in effect before January 1, 2020. Provides that if a precinct is divided to assign some of the territory of the precinct to a municipality because of an annexation, any part of the divided precinct may form a separate precinct that does not comply with the requirement that a precinct may not be established with fewer than 600 active voters. Authorizes a county executive to request from the Indiana election commission a waiver of the requirement that a precinct must have at least 600 active voters. Provides that in order for a precinct committeeman or a precinct vice committeeman (exercising the precinct committeeman's proxy) to participate in a caucus to fill a vacancy, the committeeman or vice committeeman must be entitled to vote for the office for which a successor is to be selected in the caucus. Provides that an individual who is at least 16 years of age but younger than 18 years of age may perform certain functions relating to absentee voting if the individual satisfies certain criteria. Provides that the adoption, rescission, or amendment of a vote center plan does not require the unanimous vote of the entire membership of the board if: (1) a majority vote of the entire membership of the board votes to adopt, rescind, or amend the vote center plan; and (2) at least two of the members of the board voting to adopt, rescind, or amend the vote center plan are members of different political parties. Establishes a procedure for processing the absentee ballot of a voter who fails to complete the casting of the voter's absentee ballot before an absentee voter board. Establishes a procedure for a member of the state recount commission to appoint a proxy. Establishes an administrative procedure to remove a township board member who is no longer a resident of the township. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Miscellaneous election law matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 71 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10HouseRepresentative Boy added as conferee
2020-03-10HouseRepresentative Moseley removed as conferee
2020-03-10HouseRepresentative Boy removed as advisor
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Gaskill and Breaux
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Walker and Ford J.D.
2020-03-05HouseHouse advisors appointed: Manning, Vermilion, Steuerwald, Austin, Boy and Pfaff
2020-03-05HouseHouse conferees appointed: Wesco and Moseley
2020-03-05HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2020-03-04HouseMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 300: yeas 37, nays 13
2020-03-02SenateAmendment #14 (Walker) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02SenateReread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenatePlaced back on second reading
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #4 (Ford J.D.) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #13 (Walker) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-27SenateAmendment #1 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-27SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-20SenateSenator Crane added as third sponsor
2020-02-20SenateSenator Gaskill added as second sponsor
2020-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-11SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseRepresentative Boy added as coauthor
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Walker
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 96: yeas 71, nays 27
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment
2020-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Wesco

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1222/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/2/8/ad28c900/HB1222.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/c/e/7/6ce7ee46/HB1222.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/7/9/db798997/HB1222.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/f/0/3/ef0336d1/HB1222.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/2/d/162d4995/HB1222.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/2/d/8/c2d8ff01/HB1222.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/e/0/4/9e04a6f3/HB1222.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/4/6/9/34697767/HB1222.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/f/8/3/7f831aa6/HB1222.05.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/6/3/a0639727/HB1222.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/9/4/1794d14e/HB1222.96_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/3/2/a/732adea0/HB1222.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/b/6/7bb66826/HB1222.300_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback