IN HB1220 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 163
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Withdrawals from cemetery perpetual care funds. Provides that if the perpetual care fund of a cemetery is established as a trust, the trustee may withdraw funds from it in accordance with the cemetery law and in an amount that the trustee considers necessary to pay the cost of perpetual care of the cemetery, even though terms of the trust would otherwise restrict withdrawals from the fund to a lesser amount.
Title
Withdrawals from cemetery perpetual care funds. Provides that if the perpetual care fund of a cemetery is established as a trust, the trustee may withdraw funds from it in accordance with the cemetery law and in an amount that the trustee considers necessary to pay the cost of perpetual care of the cemetery, even though terms of the trust would otherwise restrict withdrawals from the fund to a lesser amount.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Heaton [R] | Rep. James Baird [R] | Sen. Eric Bassler [R] | Sen. Rodric Bray [R] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Public Law 163 |
2016-03-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-04 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 371: yeas 88, nays 1 |
2016-03-03 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 274: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-26 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Bassler and Bray |
2016-01-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 69: yeas 95, nays 1 |
2016-01-25 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-21 | House | Representative Baird added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2016-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Heaton |