IN HB1220 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 21 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the commission for higher education to approve or disapprove existing or new associate, baccalaureate, or graduate degrees, or programs leading to a certificate or other indication of accomplishment. Requires degree proposals submitted to the commission for higher education for approval to provide justifications for any additional credit requirements. Requires each state educational institution to review its undergraduate degree programs to determine the number of credit hours required for the degree and to report the results of the review to the commission, including a justification for any associate degree program of more than 60 hours or baccalaureate degree program of more than 120 hours.
Title
Commission for higher education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 62 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 39 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-06 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-06 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 342: yeas 62, nays 21 | |
2012-02-21 | Senator Rogers added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-21 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-21 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 228: yeas 39 and nays 11 | |
2012-02-20 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-16 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-13 | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development | |
2012-01-31 | Senate sponsors: Senators Leising, Yoder and Banks | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 164: yeas 60, nays 35 | |
2012-01-17 | Third reading: call withdrawn | |
2012-01-13 | Representative Noe added as coauthor | |
2012-01-13 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-11 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Education | |
2012-01-09 | Coauthored by Representative Behning | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Rhoads |