IN HB1219 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 106
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Privacy of home addresses.
Title
Privacy of home addresses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House - Amendment 2 (Pryor), prevailed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House - Amendment 2 (Pryor), prevailed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 106 |
2013-04-29 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 517: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 317: yeas 47 and nays 0 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-02-05 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Crider and Wyss |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-05 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 76: yeas 96, nays 4 |
2013-02-04 | House | Amendment 4 (Saunders), failed; voice vote |
2013-02-04 | House | Amendment 2 (Pryor), prevailed; Roll Call 51: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2013-02-04 | House | Amendment 5 (Saunders), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-04 | House | Amendment 1 (Pryor), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-04 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-01-28 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-01-14 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-14 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Neese, McMillin and Lawson |
2013-01-14 | House | Authored by Representative Karickhoff |