IN HB1218 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-20 - Public Law 86
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Juvenile justice. Adds additional members to a community corrections advisory board. Allows an application for a state grant for a community corrections program for juveniles to be made to the department of correction division of youth services. Provides that a child who was: (1) the victim of human trafficking; and (2) adjudicated a delinquent child for an act performed while a victim of human trafficking and the delinquent act was a result of human trafficking; is entitled to have the adjudication expunged. Specifies that expunged electronic records must be stored in a secure data base. Permits the department of correction

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile justice. Adds additional members to a community corrections advisory board. Allows an application for a state grant for a community corrections program for juveniles to be made to the department of correction division of youth services. Provides that a child who was: (1) the victim of human trafficking; and (2) adjudicated a delinquent child for an act performed while a victim of human trafficking and the delinquent act was a result of human trafficking; is entitled to have the adjudication expunged. Specifies that expunged electronic records must be stored in a secure data base. Permits the department of correction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-12 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-20HousePublic Law 86
2017-04-20HouseSigned by the Governor
2017-04-19SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2017-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2017-04-17HouseSigned by the Speaker
2017-04-12HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 475: yeas 77, nays 0
2017-04-12HouseMotion to concur filed
2017-04-06SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2017-04-05SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 398: yeas 47, nays 0
2017-04-04SenateAmendment #1 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2017-04-04SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2017-04-03SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2017-03-30SenateSenator Sandlin added as cosponsor
2017-03-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-03-27SenateSenator Lanane added as cosponsor
2017-03-20SenateSenator Eckerty added as cosponsor
2017-03-20SenateSenator Messmer added as third sponsor
2017-02-20SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2017-02-15HouseReferred to the Senate
2017-02-14HouseRepresentative Porter added as coauthor
2017-02-14HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Head and Bray
2017-02-14HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 113: yeas 96, nays 0
2017-02-13HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2017-02-09HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2017-01-31HouseRepresentative Steuerwald added as coauthor
2017-01-17HouseRepresentative Candelaria Reardon added as coauthor
2017-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2017-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative McNamara

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2017/bills/house/1218/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/8/6/258694e5/HB1218.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/0/3/af03be5b/HB1218.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/c/0/91c0828f/HB1218.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/3/4/f6341086/HB1218.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/7/e/6d7efc92/HB1218.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/5/d/3/e5d3e370/HB1218.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/6/4/c664e920/HB1218.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/7/e/1/07e1401e/HB1218.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/7/1/51714c79/HB1218.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/3/7/d/237dd5ad/HB1218.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/e/d/2/5ed23eb9/HB1218.113.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/5/c/625c7d97/HB1218.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/f/c/1cfc5057/HB1218.398.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/d/c/b8dc3535/HB1218.475.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback