IN HB1218 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - Signed by the President Pro Tempore
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Expires standards for operation rules concerning prior authorization for a take home supply of opioid treatment medication (current law requires rules to require prior authorization for more than 14 days of medication). Prohibits an opioid treatment program from prescribing, dispensing, or providing more than a seven day supply of opioid treatment medication to a patient to take out of the facility. Requires the division of mental health and addiction (division) to establish certain standards and protocols for opioid treatment programs. Requires an opioid treatment program to follow the standards and protocols adopted by the division for each opioid treatment program patient. Requires the dispenser at an opioid treatment program to transmit certain information to the division within specified time frames. Provides that the information is subject to federal patient confidentiality regulations. Requires a provider to release certain information from a committed patient's mental health records upon request of a court. Requires that the board of pharmacy adopt a rule requiring a practitioner and a opioid treatment program to check the Indiana scheduled prescription electronic collection and tracking (INSPECT) program in specified circumstances. Requires the division to report on the information collected. Increases the penalty to a Level 6 felony for violations of the central repository for controlled substances data laws. Requires the Indiana professional licensing agency to study the impact of including all prescription drugs in the INSPECT program and sets forth requirements of the study. Requires the legislative council to assign an interim committee to study: (1) the security of the INSPECT program; and (2) whether opioid treatment programs should be prohibited from

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Drug treatment and reporting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health and Provider Services - Roll Call 121803 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House - Third reading: Passed: (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-01-21 - House - House Committee on Public Health - Roll Call 121801 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-25SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2014-03-25HouseSigned by the Governor
2014-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2014-03-13HouseSigned by the Speaker
2014-03-13HousePublic Law 131
2014-03-13SenateConference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 427: yeas 46 and nays 0
2014-03-12HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 adopted; Roll Call 466: yeas 97 and nays 0
2014-03-06SenateSenator Breaux added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Grooms added as advisor
2014-03-06SenateSenator Mrvan added as conferee
2014-03-06SenateSenator Pat Miller added as conferee
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Shackleford added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Washburne added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Clere added as advisor
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative C. Brown added as conferee
2014-03-06HouseRepresentative Davisson added as conferee
2014-03-05HouseHouse dissented from Senate Amendments
2014-03-04SenateThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 314: yeas 48 and nays 0
2014-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2014-03-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed.
2014-03-03SenateHB 1218 Amendment #2 (Lanane), prevailed.
2014-03-03SenateHB 1218 Amendment #1 (Miller, Pat), prevailed.
2014-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-02-13SenateReassigned to Health and Provider Services, pursuant to rule 68(b)
2014-02-04SenateFirst Reading: Referred to Judiciary
2014-01-30HouseSenator Grooms added as second sponsor.
2014-01-30HouseSenator Miller Patricia added as first sponsor.
2014-01-30HouseReferred to the Senate
2014-01-30HouseThird reading: Passed: Roll Call 152: yeas 95 and nays 0
2014-01-29HouseHB 1218 Amendment #2 (Clere), prevailed.
2014-01-29HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2014-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted.
2014-01-14HouseFirst Reading: Referred to Public Health
2014-01-14HouseCoauthored by Representative Clere
2014-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Davisson.

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2014/bills/house/1218/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/8/f/1/68f15546/HB1218.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/9/0/6/c906c8c4/HB1218.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/7/8/6f7897c4/HB1218.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/c/8/5/4c85b9cc/HB1218.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/c/3/d7c31454/HB1218.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/0/2/db02c8c6/HB1218.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/6/2/e2626070/HB1218.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/0/4/6f0496dc/HB1218.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/a/e/14aec7f5/HB1218.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/7/8/e/378e14c6/HB1218.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/c/b/0/acb0680c/HB1218.06.ENRH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/a/5/c/9a5c3041/HB1218.01.INTR.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/6/3/4263f401/HB1218.03.ENGH.152.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/1/d/9/f1d96bc2/HB1218.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/9/f/1b9fb255/HB1218.05.ENGS.314.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/1/2/1412be88/HB1218.05.ENGS.466.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/0/5/fe05e277/HB1218.05.ENGS.427.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback