IN HB1216 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 131
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

First steps program. Provides that, for purposes of determining a family's income under the first steps program, a family is presumed to have an income that is not more than 250% of the federal income poverty level if the family is receiving benefits under Medicaid, the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP), or the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program. Requires the division of disability and rehabilitative services to review and revise the division's policy regarding make-up therapy sessions, including defining what constitutes a "make-up" or "missed" session, based on recommendations from the interagency coordinating council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

First steps program. Provides that, for purposes of determining a family's income under the first steps program, a family is presumed to have an income that is not more than 250% of the federal income poverty level if the family is receiving benefits under Medicaid, the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program (SNAP), or the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program. Requires the division of disability and rehabilitative services to review and revise the division's policy regarding make-up therapy sessions, including defining what constitutes a "make-up" or "missed" session, based on recommendations from the interagency coordinating council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HousePublic Law 131
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-17HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 545: yeas 92, nays 0
2019-04-17HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-03-28SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-03-26SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-26SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 322: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-03-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-21SenateSenator Ford Jon added as cosponsor
2019-03-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-04SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseCosponsor: Senator Breaux
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Houchin, Brown L and Garten
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 215: yeas 95, nays 0
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-15HouseRepresentatives Karickhoff, Behning, Hamilton added as coauthors
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1216/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/3/4/c134c791/HB1216.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/b/e/03bed01d/HB1216.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/7/3/4773c698/HB1216.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/b/a/27bafd1d/HB1216.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/6/4/4a64428f/HB1216.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/5/e/b/65eb33fe/HB1216.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/0/4/5704d021/HB1216.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/e/b/3/ceb3c5a0/HB1216.01.INTR.04.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/f/c/b9fca1da/HB1216.215.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/0/a/dd0aa70d/HB1216.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/a/0/14a057cf/HB1216.322.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/f/8/2/0f829f0e/HB1216.545.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback