IN HB1216 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on February 20 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain blood disposal requirements do not apply to autologous donations for stem cell transplantation. Provides that the crime of transferring contaminated body fluids does not apply to autologous blood donations for stem cell transplantation.
Title
Self-donated blood.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-31 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-03-08 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2012-03-07 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2012-03-06 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2012-03-05 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 340: yeas 93, nays 0 | |
2012-02-20 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2012-02-20 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 209: yeas 50 and nays 0 | |
2012-02-13 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-02-09 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2012-01-31 | Senate sponsor: Senator Miller | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to the Senate | |
2012-01-31 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 163: yeas 95, nays 0 | |
2012-01-27 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-25 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-23 | Representative Welch added as coauthor | |
2012-01-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2012-01-09 | Authored by Representative Kirchhofer |