IN HB1216 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the state president of the Associated Builders and Contractors of Indiana appoints a member of a common construction wage committee currently appointed by the governor. Removes the current $150,000 threshold for the application of the common construction wage statute effective July 1, 2011. Establishes the threshold for the application of the common construction wage statute at $250,000 for contracts awarded after December 31, 2011, and before January 1, 2013, and at $350,000 for contracts awarded after December 31, 2012. Provides that a committee must consider any written reports with respect to wage scales submitted by the Indiana State Building and Construction Trades Council or the Associated Builders and Contractors of Indiana when making a determination of the common construction wage for a public works project. Provides that a public works project may not be artificially divided to avoid application of the common construction wage statute. Urges the legislative council to assign the following topics to a study committee during the 2011 legislative interim: (1) The use of an agreement with a labor organization on public works projects covered by a public works statute. (2) Job classifications used in a common construction wage determination. Makes technical changes.
Title
Public works projects.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Davis [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-29 - House - House - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House (Y: 52 N: 47 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Tallian), failed (Y: 9 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 6 (Kersey), failed (Y: 41 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 5 (Bartlett), failed (Y: 39 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Moseley), failed (Y: 41 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 2 (Niezgodski), failed (Y: 41 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 13 (Davis), prevailed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-29 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 1 (Tallian), failed (Y: 9 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 54 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 6 (Kersey), failed (Y: 41 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 5 (Bartlett), failed (Y: 39 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Moseley), failed (Y: 41 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 2 (Niezgodski), failed (Y: 41 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-28 - House - House - Amendment 13 (Davis), prevailed (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 195 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 716: yeas 52, nays 47 | |
2011-04-29 | Conference committee report 1 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 510: yeas 30, nays 20 | |
2011-04-28 | Rules suspended | |
2011-04-28 | Conference committee report 1 : filed in the House | |
2011-04-28 | Senator Boots added as conferee | |
2011-04-28 | Senator Boots removed as advisor | |
2011-04-28 | Representative Torr added as conferee | |
2011-04-28 | Representative Torr removed as House advisor | |
2011-04-28 | Representative Niezgodski removed as conferee | |
2011-04-28 | Senator Tallian removed as conferee | |
2011-04-26 | Senate advisors appointed: Boots, Kruse and Skinner | |
2011-04-26 | Senate conferee appointed: Walker and Tallian | |
2011-04-26 | House advisors appointed: Messmer, Torr, Bartlett, Tyler, Kersey and Moseley | |
2011-04-26 | House conferees appointed: Davis and Niezgodski | |
2011-04-26 | House dissented from Senate amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 403: yeas 27 and nays 22 | |
2011-04-18 | Amendment 1 (Tallian), failed; Roll Call 361: yeas 17, nays 32 | |
2011-04-18 | Amendment 3 (Walker), prevailed; | |
2011-04-18 | Amendment 2 (Walker), prevailed; | |
2011-04-18 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | |
2011-03-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators Walker, Boots and Kruse | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 377: yeas 54, nays 44 | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment 6 (Kersey), failed; Roll Call 276: yeas 41, nays 58 | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment 5 (Bartlett), failed; Roll Call 275: yeas 39, nays 60 | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment 3 (Moseley), failed; Roll Call 274: yeas 41, nays 58 | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment 2 (Niezgodski), failed; Roll Call 273: yeas 41, nays 57 | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment 13 (Davis), prevailed; Roll Call 272: yeas 97, nays 0 | |
2011-03-28 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-12 | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions | |
2011-01-12 | Authored by Representative Davis |