IN HB1212 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
Pending: Senate Rules and Legislative Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-26 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
Pending: Senate Rules and Legislative Procedure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Use of purple marks to deny entry to property. Authorizes the use of purple marks to post real property against trespassers.
Title
Use of purple marks to deny entry to property. Authorizes the use of purple marks to post real property against trespassers.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Bartels [R] | Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Linda Lawson [D] |
Sen. Mark Messmer [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Civil Law |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-02-01 | House | Representative Lawson added as coauthor |
2018-02-01 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Messmer |
2018-02-01 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 130: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2018-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-30 | House | Representative Miller added as coauthor |
2018-01-29 | House | Representative McNamara added as coauthor |
2018-01-29 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-11 | House | Authored by Representative Bartels |