IN HB1211 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-16 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State and local administration. Provides that not later than October 1, 2022, the department of administration (department), on behalf of the office of technology (office), shall issue a request for information for purposes of exploring how blockchain technology could be used by a state agency to: (1) achieve greater cost efficiency and cost effectiveness; and (2) improve consumer convenience, experience, data security, and data privacy. Requires the office to compile a report concerning the request for information and submit the report to the legislative council in an electronic format not later than March 31, 2023. Defines "blockchain technology" and "distributed ledger technology". Requires an agency to submit an emergency rule to the attorney general for review and approval before the emergency rule may take effect. Provides that emergency rules may not be effective for a period that exceeds 180 days. Provides that certain emergency rules expire not more than two years after the rule takes effect. Requires an agency adopting an administrative rule to submit an economic impact statement and an explanation of any penalty, fine, or other similar negative impact included in the proposed rule to the publisher of the Indiana Administrative Code (publisher). Requires the publisher to provide a copy of the materials concerning a proposed rule or pending readoption to the members of the appropriate standing committee, the governor, and the office of management and budget. Provides that administrative rules expire on July 1 of the fourth year after the year in which the rule takes effect (instead of January 1 of the seventh year after the year in which the rule takes effect). Requires an agency intending to readopt an administrative rule to provide to the publisher, not later than January 1 of the third year after the year in which the rule most recently took effect: (1) notice of; and (2) information concerning; the pending readoption. Requires that all broadband infrastructure projects that are funded in whole or in part by a grant or loan from the regional economic acceleration and development initiative (READI) fund must satisfy the criteria and requirements as described in the rural broadband program. Makes corresponding changes.
Title
State and local administration.
Sponsors
Rep. Jake Teshka [R] | Rep. Timothy O'Brien [R] | Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Blake Johnson [D] |
Sen. Chris Garten [R] | Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Sen. Scott Baldwin [R] |
Sen. Stacey Donato [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Clyde Perfect [R] | Sen. Eddie Melton [D] |
Sen. Justin Busch [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 63 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 63 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 370: yeas 31, nays 19 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 389: yeas 63, nays 28 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senator Perfect added as conferee |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senator Melton removed as conferee |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Ford Jon and Griffin |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Garten and Melton |
2022-02-28 | House | House advisors appointed: O'Brien, Heaton and Campbell |
2022-02-28 | House | House conferees appointed: Teshka and Johnson |
2022-02-28 | House | House dissented from Senate amendments |
2022-02-28 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senator Busch added as cosponsor |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senators Baldwin, Donato, Koch, Perfect, Melton added as cosponsors |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-20 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Garten, Ford Jon, Ford J.D. |
2022-01-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 52: yeas 86, nays 0 |
2022-01-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-13 | House | Representatives Miller and Johnson added as coauthors |
2022-01-12 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2022-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2022-01-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative O'Brien |
2022-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Teshka |