IN HB1211 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-21 - Public Law 76
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Methamphetamine and criminal mischief. Includes the attempted manufacture of methamphetamine in the statutory definition of "methamphetamine abuse". Requires law enforcement agencies to report fires related to methamphetamine abuse to the Indiana criminal justice institute. Makes it institutional criminal mischief, a Class A misdemeanor, for a person to recklessly, knowingly, or intentionally damage property: (1) that is vacant real property or a vacant structure; or (2) after the person has been denied entry to the property by a court order that was issued to the person or to the general public by conspicuous posting on or around the property in areas
Title
Methamphetamine and criminal mischief. Includes the attempted manufacture of methamphetamine in the statutory definition of "methamphetamine abuse". Requires law enforcement agencies to report fires related to methamphetamine abuse to the Indiana criminal justice institute. Makes it institutional criminal mischief, a Class A misdemeanor, for a person to recklessly, knowingly, or intentionally damage property: (1) that is vacant real property or a vacant structure; or (2) after the person has been denied entry to the property by a court order that was issued to the person or to the general public by conspicuous posting on or around the property in areas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-21 | House | Public Law 76 |
2016-03-21 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-10 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2016-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 444: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 411: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Bray, Young R Michael, Lanane and Glick |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Brown L and Tallian |
2016-03-03 | House | House advisors appointed: Smaltz, Ziemke and Pierce |
2016-03-03 | House | House conferees appointed: Carbaugh and Moed |
2016-03-02 | House | House dissented from Senate Amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | Motion to dissent filed |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as cosponsor |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 273: yeas 49, nays 1 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Glick added as second sponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as cosponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-02-02 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Brown L |
2016-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 140: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2016-02-01 | House | Amendment #1 (Washburne) prevailed; voice vote |
2016-02-01 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-26 | House | Representative Moed added as coauthor |
2016-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2016-01-07 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Smaltz and Ober |
2016-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Carbaugh |