IN HB1210 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 49-6)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - SECTIONS 2 through 16 effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 49-6)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - SECTIONS 2 through 16 effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits state agencies from entering contracts with or making grants to any entity that performs abortions or maintains or operates a facility where abortions are performed. Cancels state funding for any current contracts with or grants to any entity that performs abortions or maintains or operates a facility where abortions are performed. States public policy findings concerning a fetus feeling pain and a compelling state interest in protecting the fetus. Sets requirements for performing an abortion after the first trimester but before the earlier of viability of the fetus or 20 weeks of postfertilization age of the fetus (current law requirements are based on viability of the fetus). Requires that a physician determine the postfertilization age of a fetus before performing an abortion, and allows for the discipline of a physician who fails to do this in certain circumstances. Adds information that a pregnant woman must be informed of orally and in writing (current law requires that the information be given only orally) before an abortion may be performed concerning the physician, risks involved, information concerning the fetus, available assistance, and existing law. Requires a pregnant woman seeking an abortion to view fetal ultrasound imaging unless the pregnant woman states in writing that the pregnant woman does not want to view the fetal ultrasound imaging. Requires a physician who performs an abortion to: (1) have admitting privileges at a hospital in the county or in a contiguous county to the county where the abortion is performed; or (2) enter into an agreement with a physician who has admitting privileges in the county or contiguous county; and notify the patient of the hospital location where the patient can receive follow-up care by the physician. Requires the state department of health to post Internet website links on the state department's web site to materials setting forth certain information concerning a fetus and abortion. Prohibits qualified health plans under the federal health care reform law from providing coverage for abortions except for in certain circumstances.
Title
Abortion matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 5 (Schneider), prevailed (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 8 (Sullivan), failed (Y: 33 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 10 (L. Lawson), prevailed (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Riecken), failed (Y: 25 N: 68 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 12 (Pierce), failed (Y: 41 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 2 (VanDenburgh), failed (Y: 40 N: 54 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 4 (Riecken), failed (Y: 42 N: 54 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 11 (Welch), failed (Y: 41 N: 52 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 15 (Candelaria Reardon), failed (Y: 21 N: 74 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 9 (Austin), prevailed (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 683 (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 682 (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Amendment 5 (Schneider), prevailed (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 72 N: 23 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 8 (Sullivan), failed (Y: 33 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 10 (L. Lawson), prevailed (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 3 (Riecken), failed (Y: 25 N: 68 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 12 (Pierce), failed (Y: 41 N: 56 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 2 (VanDenburgh), failed (Y: 40 N: 54 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 4 (Riecken), failed (Y: 42 N: 54 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 11 (Welch), failed (Y: 41 N: 52 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 15 (Candelaria Reardon), failed (Y: 21 N: 74 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-29 - House - House - Amendment 9 (Austin), prevailed (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 683 (Y: 61 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House - Roll Call 682 (Y: 60 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | SECTIONS 2 through 16 effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | SECTION 1 effective 05/10/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 193 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-05-05 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-29 | Joint Rule 20 technical correction adopted by the Senate | |
2011-04-27 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 684: yeas 66, nays 32 | |
2011-04-19 | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-19 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 402: yeas 35 and nays 13 | |
2011-04-18 | Senator M. Young added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-18 | Amendment 5 (Schneider), prevailed; Roll Call 360: yeas 36, nays 13 | |
2011-04-18 | Amendment 4 (Lanane), failed; | |
2011-04-18 | Amendment 2 (Miller), prevailed; | |
2011-04-18 | Amendment 1 (Miller), prevailed; | |
2011-04-18 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Senator Yoder added as cosponsor | |
2011-04-14 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | |
2011-03-30 | Cosponsor: Senator Schneider | |
2011-03-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators Miller, Walker and Banks | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 378: yeas 72, nays 23 | |
2011-03-29 | Amendment 8 (Sullivan), failed; Roll Call 307: yeas 33, nays 64 | |
2011-03-29 | Amendment 10 (L. Lawson), prevailed; Roll Call 306: yeas 90, nays 7 | |
2011-03-29 | Amendment 3 (Riecken), failed; Roll Call 305: yeas 25, nays 68 | |
2011-03-29 | Amendment 12 (Pierce), failed; Roll Call 304: yeas 41, nays 56 | |
2011-03-29 | Amendment 2 (VanDenburgh), failed; Roll Call 303: yeas 40, nays 54 | |
2011-03-29 | Amendment 4 (Riecken), failed; Roll Call 302: yeas 42, nays 54 | |
2011-03-29 | Amendment 11 (Welch), failed; Roll Call 301: yeas 41, nays 52 | |
2011-03-29 | Amendment 15 (Candelaria Reardon), failed; Roll Call 300: yeas 21, nays 74 | |
2011-03-29 | Amendment 9 (Austin), prevailed; Roll Call 299: yeas 90, nays 6 | |
2011-03-29 | Amendment 13 (Messmer), prevailed; Division of the House: yeas 70, nays 23 | |
2011-03-29 | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2011-03-28 | Amendment 1 (Messmer), no action taken | |
2011-03-28 | Second reading: call withdrawn | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2011-02-03 | Representatives Bacon, Battles, Behning, Borders, Bosma, Burton, Cherry, Clere, Davis, Davisson, Dembowski, Dodge, Ellspermann, Espich, Foley, Friend, Frizzell, R. Frye, Goodin, Gutwein, Heaton, Heuer, Hinkle, Karickhoff, Knollman, Koch, Kubacki, Lehe, Lehman, Lutz, Mahan, McClain, McMillin, Messmer, Morris, Neese, Noe, Pond, Rhoads, M. Smith, Soliday, Speedy, Steuerwald, Thompson, Truitt, Ubelhor, VanNatter, Welch, Wesco, Wolkins and Yarde added as coauthors | |
2011-02-03 | Reassigned to Committee on Public Policy | |
2011-01-12 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | |
2011-01-12 | Coauthored by Representatives Cheatham and Culver | |
2011-01-12 | Authored by Representative Turner |