IN HB1209 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 169
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Discipline of coaches. Requires the department of education (department) to notify the Indiana High School Athletic Association (association) of any license revocation or suspension involving a licensed teacher who has been convicted of certain offenses or committed certain misconduct. Provides that a school corporation, charter high school, or nonpublic high school with at least one employee must report to the association when a nonteaching or volunteer coach has been convicted of certain offenses. Requires the association to revoke the accreditation of any coach who has been convicted of certain offenses. Provides that, before a school corporation, charter high school, or nonpublic high school with at least one employee hires or allows an individual to coach an association recognized sport, the school corporation, charter high school, or nonpublic high school shall: (1) ask the individual: (A) whether the individual is or has been accredited by the association; and (B) if the individual is or has been accredited by the association, whether the individual's accreditation has ever been suspended or revoked; (2) request references from the individual; (3) contact the references that the individual provides; and (4) contact the association to determine whether the individual's accreditation has ever been suspended or revoked. Requires expanded criminal history checks for volunteer coaches. Provides that school corporations, charter high schools, and nonpublic high schools with at least one employee are, regarding volunteer coaches, subject to a statute that establishes a penalty if an employer prevents a discharged employee from obtaining employment with any other person and provides civil immunity regarding certain disclosures. Provides that the: (1) association or its employees; (2) department or the department's employees; or (3) school corporation, charter high school, or nonpublic high school with at least one employee or its employees; are immune from civil liability for any act done or omitted unless the action constitutes gross negligence or willful or wanton misconduct.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Discipline of coaches. Requires the department of education (department) to notify the Indiana High School Athletic Association (association) of any license revocation or suspension involving a licensed teacher who has been convicted of certain offenses or committed certain misconduct. Provides that a school corporation, charter high school, or nonpublic high school with at least one employee must report to the association when a nonteaching or volunteer coach has been convicted of certain offenses. Requires the association to revoke the accreditation of any coach who has been convicted of certain offenses. Provides that, before a school corporation, charter high school, or nonpublic high school with at least one employee hires or allows an individual to coach an association recognized sport, the school corporation, charter high school, or nonpublic high school shall: (1) ask the individual: (A) whether the individual is or has been accredited by the association; and (B) if the individual is or has been accredited by the association, whether the individual's accreditation has ever been suspended or revoked; (2) request references from the individual; (3) contact the references that the individual provides; and (4) contact the association to determine whether the individual's accreditation has ever been suspended or revoked. Requires expanded criminal history checks for volunteer coaches. Provides that school corporations, charter high schools, and nonpublic high schools with at least one employee are, regarding volunteer coaches, subject to a statute that establishes a penalty if an employer prevents a discharged employee from obtaining employment with any other person and provides civil immunity regarding certain disclosures. Provides that the: (1) association or its employees; (2) department or the department's employees; or (3) school corporation, charter high school, or nonpublic high school with at least one employee or its employees; are immune from civil liability for any act done or omitted unless the action constitutes gross negligence or willful or wanton misconduct.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01HousePublic Law 169
2019-05-01HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-17HouseHouse reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 544: yeas 92, nays 0
2019-04-17HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-11SenateSenate advisors appointed: Kruse, Stoops, Raatz and Spartz
2019-04-11SenateSenate conferees appointed: Head and Melton
2019-04-11HouseHouse advisors appointed: Abbott, Cook, Jordan, Klinker and Pfaff
2019-04-11HouseHouse conferees appointed: Schaibley and Goodin
2019-04-09HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-08HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-05SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 386: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-02SenateAmendment #2 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-02SenateAmendment #1 (Head) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-02SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-01SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-03-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-19SenateSenator Raatz added as third sponsor
2019-03-14SenateSenator Kruse added as second sponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-01-25HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-24HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Head
2019-01-24HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 98, nays 0
2019-01-22HouseAmendment #1 (Schaibley) prevailed; voice vote
2019-01-22HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-01-17HouseRepresentative Goodin added as coauthor
2019-01-17HouseRepresentative Thompson added as coauthor
2019-01-17HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-16HouseRepresentative Cook added as coauthor
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Schaibley

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1209/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/9/f/999f923a/HB1209.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/0/b/860bb8b1/HB1209.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/2/f/d92f65ff/HB1209.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/d/a/3/cda35e44/HB1209.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/2/f/932f305d/HB1209.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/1/8/a/618a72c4/HB1209.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/c/2/ddc2049b/HB1209.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/3/a/d/13ada948/HB1209.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/e/b/5/6eb57981/HB1209.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/e/b/a/4eba24c0/HB1209.05.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/0/8/b/908bc2ce/HB1209.06.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/f/c/dbfc28cf/HB1209.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/6/0/b/f60beec2/HB1209.35.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/d/4/c/8d4c0f4d/HB1209.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/8/b/748bf207/HB1209.386.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/0/a/e/30aeeffa/HB1209.544.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback