IN HB1208 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-05 - Public Law 244
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibited name change. Defines "lifetime sex or violent offender" and prohibits, with certain exceptions, a lifetime sex or violent offender from changing the offender's name. Requires the local law enforcement authority in the county of conviction to take reasonable steps to notify the victim if a lifetime sex or violent offender changes the offender's name, and authorizes a prosecuting attorney to assist with the notification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibited name change. Defines "lifetime sex or violent offender" and prohibits, with certain exceptions, a lifetime sex or violent offender from changing the offender's name. Requires the local law enforcement authority in the county of conviction to take reasonable steps to notify the victim if a lifetime sex or violent offender changes the offender's name, and authorizes a prosecuting attorney to assist with the notification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-05HousePublic Law 244
2019-05-05HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-30SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-24HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-23SenateRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 577: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-23HouseRules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 599: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-04-23SenateCCR # 1 filed in the Senate
2019-04-23HouseCCR # 1 filed in the House
2019-04-15SenateSenate advisors appointed: Houchin and Taylor G
2019-04-15SenateSenate conferees appointed: Grooms and Randolph Lonnie M
2019-04-15HouseHouse advisors appointed: McNamara, Engleman, Beck and Pierce
2019-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Clere and Hatcher
2019-04-11HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-11HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 424: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-04SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-02SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-03-11SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2019-01-30HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-29HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Grooms and Houchin
2019-01-29HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 61: yeas 96, nays 0
2019-01-28HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-24HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2019-01-10HouseCoauthored by Representatives McNamara, Hatcher and Engleman
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1208/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/0/3/f/d03fdb72/HB1208.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/7/7/2b77a28b/HB1208.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/5/2/4/a5243b2e/HB1208.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/6/2/1/7621f1c9/HB1208.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/6/d/2/66d25aac/HB1208.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/b/7/8/ab787e8b/HB1208.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/3/3/8/b3384738/HB1208.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/d/7/1/ed712613/HB1208.61.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/6/b/9/e6b946e7/HB1208.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/7/2/c8720f87/HB1208.424.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/5/1/6f516e20/HB1208.599.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/d/6/6/7d661bd1/HB1208.577.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback