IN HB1204 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-07 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Rehabilitation center funding. Establishes the long term recovery group for Southwest Indiana program (program) and the long term recovery group for Southwest Indiana fund. Makes an appropriation for the development of the program for the state fiscal year beginning July 1, 2021, and ending June 20, 2022. Makes annual appropriations for the operation of the program beginning with the state fiscal year beginning July 1, 2022, and ending June 30, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rehabilitation center funding.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2021-01-07HouseCoauthored by Representative Sullivan
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative McNamara

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback