IN HB1204 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-05 - First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Education matters. Requires that the February count of a school corporation's average daily membership (ADM) must be increased by the number of students who, during the students' expected graduation year: (1) were enrolled in the school corporation on the September ADM count day; (2) completed graduation requirements before the February ADM count day; and (3) were not enrolled in the school corporation on the February ADM count day. Removes the cap on the amount of career and technical education enrollment grants that may be distributed per state fiscal year. Requires, not later than November 1, 2020, the department of education (department) to establish standards concerning the following: (1) The minimum amount of time that a student of a virtual charter school must participate in educational activities provided by the virtual charter school each semester of the school year. (2) Requirements that a student of a virtual charter school participate in the statewide assessment or an alternate assessment, as applicable. Provides that, if a student of a virtual charter school fails, in a semester, to meet the standards, the student must be withdrawn from enrollment in the virtual charter school and may not reenroll or enroll in another virtual charter school. Requires, beginning January 1, 2021, the department to reduce state tuition support distribution to a virtual charter school if students of the virtual charter school fail to meet the standards.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-30 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House - Amendment #7 (DeLaney) prevailed (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Floor - (Y: 61 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House Floor - (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
2020-01-31HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-30HouseCosponsor: Senator Mishler
2020-01-30HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Raatz, Crider, Bassler
2020-01-30HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 137: yeas 94, nays 0
2020-01-29HouseAmendment #7 (DeLaney) prevailed; Roll Call 125: yeas 93, nays 0
2020-01-29HouseAmendment #6 (Beck) ruled out of order
2020-01-29HouseAmendment #3 (Porter) ruled out of order
2020-01-29HouseAppeal the ruling of the chair (Porter); ruling of the chair sustained Roll Call 124: yeas 61, nays 33
2020-01-29HouseAmendment #2 (Porter) ruled out of order
2020-01-29HouseAppeal the ruling of the chair (Porter); ruling of the chair sustained Roll Call 123: yeas 62, nays 32
2020-01-29HouseAmendment #1 (Porter) ruled out of order
2020-01-29HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-28HouseRepresentatives Cook, Thompson, Goodin added as coauthors
2020-01-27HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2020-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Cherry

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback