IN HB1203 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Public Law 113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Public Law 113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Qualified egg banks. Amends, for purposes of the law regarding unlawful transfer of a human organism, the definition of "qualified third party" and changes the term to "qualified egg bank". Specifies qualifications for a physician overseeing medical services related to ovum cryopreservation. Specifies requirements that must be met by a fertility clinic or similar medical facility in order to be considered a qualified egg bank. Exempts from the criminal offense of unlawful transfer of a human organism the payment to or receipt by a qualified egg bank of an amount for: (1) the retrieval of a human ovum; (2) the
Title
Qualified egg banks. Amends, for purposes of the law regarding unlawful transfer of a human organism, the definition of "qualified third party" and changes the term to "qualified egg bank". Specifies qualifications for a physician overseeing medical services related to ovum cryopreservation. Specifies requirements that must be met by a fertility clinic or similar medical facility in order to be considered a qualified egg bank. Exempts from the criminal offense of unlawful transfer of a human organism the payment to or receipt by a qualified egg bank of an amount for: (1) the retrieval of a human ovum; (2) the
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Public Law 113 |
2018-03-15 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 316: yeas 31, nays 18 |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2018-01-23 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Crider |
2018-01-23 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Becker, Breaux and Mishler |
2018-01-23 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 47: yeas 88, nays 8 |
2018-01-22 | House | Representative Frizzell added as coauthor |
2018-01-22 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-18 | House | Representatives Shackleford and Brown, C. added as coauthors |
2018-01-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-09 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2018-01-09 | House | Authored by Representative Eberhart |