IN HB1203 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - Effective 07/01/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that: (1) an individual's right to vote by secret ballot in; and (2) an employer's right to engage in a campaign in connection with; an election that is required or permitted by Indiana or federal law for the designation, authorization, or retention of employee representation is guaranteed, unless there is a conflict with the National Labor Relations Act or another federal law or regulation concerning labor relations or labor organizations. Provides that the results of an election that violates these rights are void.
Title
Employee representation campaigns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 35 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 60 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | Effective 07/01/2011 | |
2011-05-16 | Public Law 192 | |
2011-05-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-25 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2011-04-21 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2011-04-19 | Returned to the House without amendments | |
2011-04-19 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 401: yeas 35 and nays 13 | |
2011-04-18 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-03-31 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | |
2011-03-30 | Senate sponsors: Senators M. Young and Steele | |
2011-03-30 | Referred to the Senate | |
2011-03-30 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 379: yeas 60, nays 33 | |
2011-03-28 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-17 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-10 | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions | |
2011-01-10 | Coauthored by Representatives Bacon, Torr and Foley | |
2011-01-10 | Authored by Representative Ubelhor |