IN HB1202 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 14 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-14 - Senate advisors appointed: Boots and Tallian
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Sentencing. Establishes a procedure to allows certain inmates in the department of correction (department) an additional opportunity to request sentence modification from the sentencing court if the department has recommended sentence modification. Makes conforming amendments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sentencing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - (Y: 15 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 89 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-14SenateSenate advisors appointed: Boots and Tallian
2021-04-14SenateSenate conferees appointed: Bohacek and Taylor G
2021-04-14HouseHouse advisors appointed: Morris, Young J and Hatcher
2021-04-14HouseHouse conferees appointed: McNamara and Hatfield
2021-04-14HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2021-04-14HouseMotion to dissent filed
2021-04-14SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2021-04-13SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 418: yeas 44, nays 5
2021-04-12SenateAmendment #1 (Young M) prevailed; Division of the Senate: yeas 39, nays 10
2021-04-12SenateAmendment #3 (Tallian) failed; Roll Call 405: yeas 15, nays 35
2021-04-12SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2021-04-08SenateSenator Tallian added as cosponsor
2021-04-08SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-02-23SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
2021-02-17HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-16HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Bohacek and Boots
2021-02-16HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 139: yeas 89, nays 7
2021-02-08HouseRepresentative Hatfield added as coauthor
2021-02-08HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-02-04HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2021-01-07HouseCoauthored by Representative Morris
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative McNamara

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1202/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/c/6/a6c66063/HB1202.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/7/8/3/a783dcab/HB1202.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/9/a/699a7d8d/HB1202.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/4/9/f049b5db/HB1202.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/f/9/d/6f9d7c4a/HB1202.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/5/a/5/45a5962f/HB1202.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/6/8/14683675/HB1202.04.ENGS.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/0/c/c/70cce08a/HB1202.03.COMS.AMS001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/d/6/0/6d60e641/HB1202.03.COMS.AMS002.pdf
Amendmenthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/6/7/e8670322/HB1202.03.COMS.AMS003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/a/5/1/ca51591e/HB1202.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/3/8/0/3380ffff/HB1202.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/6/a/a/86aac239/HB1202.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/6/a/d/36ad3f30/HB1202.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/b/2/0/3b207598/HB1202.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/a/f/0aafa51c/HB1202.02.COMH.CRS001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/c/5/1/dc51b02a/HB1202.03.COMS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/a/8/7/5a8750d5/HB1202.04.ENGS.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/0/b/b/80bbcb3e/HB1202.04.ENGS.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/3/8/f/638f6f0d/HB1202.04.ENGS.DIS01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/1/3/d/a13db474/HB1202.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/4/a/5/94a559d2/HB1202.139_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/e/b/fceb1bfb/HB1202.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/0/d/fb0d1f09/HB1202.405_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/9/5/5/d95514bf/HB1202.418_S.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback