IN HB1201 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-03 - Referred to the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Emergency transport of injured operational canine. Provides that if there is not an individual requiring medical attention or transport, a paramedic, advanced emergency medical technician, or emergency medical technician may use emergency ambulance services to transport an operational canine injured in the line of duty to a veterinary hospital or clinic. Specifies the care that may be provided to the operational canine. Specifies who is responsible for the transportation and treatment cost of an injured operational canine. Provides that a paramedic, advanced emergency medical technician, or emergency medical technician who in the performance of their duties and in good faith renders care or transportation to an injured operational canine is not liable: (1) for any act or omission when rendering the care or transportation; or (2) to the veterinary hospital or clinic for expenses incurred for emergency care provided to the injured operational canine. Requires that a written agreement concerning the transport and care of an operational canine must specify what services are covered under the agreement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergency transport of injured operational canine.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-03HouseReferred to the Senate
2021-02-02HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Crider
2021-02-02HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 45: yeas 91, nays 3
2021-02-01HouseRepresentative Moseley added as coauthor
2021-02-01HouseRepresentatives Bartels and Ledbetter C added as coauthors
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2021-01-28HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2021-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2021-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative McNamara

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2021/bills/house/1201/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/d/8/2/5d822f43/HB1201.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/6/1/4/a61412e9/HB1201.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/f/2/5/8f255394/HB1201.02.COMH.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/2/a/9/f2a909fc/HB1201.01.INTR.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/d/7/1/1d7148ae/HB1201.01.INTR.CRH001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/2/5/3a25d8bf/HB1201.02.COMH.FN001.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/5/5/fb553a4b/HB1201.02.COMH.FN002.pdf
Supplementhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/4/6/a/f46a361e/HB1201.02.COMH.FN003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/0/0/8800d645/HB1201.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/2/6/8/d268f829/HB1201.45_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback