IN HB1200 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 130
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Telepsychology. Allows a psychologist to use telepsychology. Requires the psychologist who uses telepsychology to ensure that confidential communications stored electronically cannot be recovered or accessed by unauthorized persons when the psychologist disposes of electronic equipment and data.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telepsychology. Allows a psychologist to use telepsychology. Requires the psychologist who uses telepsychology to ensure that confidential communications stored electronically cannot be recovered or accessed by unauthorized persons when the psychologist disposes of electronic equipment and data.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HousePublic Law 130
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-18SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-16HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-15HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 527: yeas 92, nays 0
2019-04-15HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 423: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-08SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-01-28HouseRepresentative Bacon added as coauthor
2019-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Charbonneau, Becker and Breaux
2019-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 49: yeas 97, nays 0
2019-01-24HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-01-22HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-10HouseCoauthored by Representatives Kirchhofer and Shackleford
2019-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative Frizzell

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1200/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/9/a/c/89ac7f9a/HB1200.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/9/0/cb900a7b/HB1200.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/e/a/dfea14fd/HB1200.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/c/9/dfc97c8a/HB1200.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/0/d/740d7f68/HB1200.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/e/1/8/ee1800c2/HB1200.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/9/b/4/19b4a630/HB1200.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/5/e/fa5e1eab/HB1200.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/9/3/2/59323f0c/HB1200.49.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/1/9/f01942c7/HB1200.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/d/e/8/4de8b144/HB1200.423.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/1/e/621e8e5e/HB1200.527.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback