IN HB1199 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 44
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Palliative care. Defines the terms "community based palliative care" and "palliative care". Provides that a hospice provider may provide community based palliative care to a patient who is not eligible for hospice care if the hospice provider: (1) meets certain licensing requirements; and (2) is certified in community based palliative care by an organization approved the state department of health.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Palliative care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 44
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 308: yeas 92, nays 0
2020-03-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-02-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 245: yeas 42, nays 2
2020-02-24SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-24SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-20SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseCosponsor: Senator Breaux
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Grooms, Messmer, Ruckelshaus
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 93: yeas 97, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseRepresentatives Lindauer, Bacon, Fleming added as coauthors
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2020-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1199/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/0/6/a/106a9185/HB1199.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/f/0/1/af01bf96/HB1199.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/f/5/2/bf528ccd/HB1199.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/1/3/8/11385e65/HB1199.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/4/9/b5493930/HB1199.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/4/7/f/447f6b8c/HB1199.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/c/b/b/2cbbc98e/HB1199.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/c/2/b/cc2b07f0/HB1199.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/b/d/1/dbd1bff1/HB1199.93_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/0/4/1404059c/HB1199.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/1/d/e/41de0058/HB1199.245_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/1/6/8116c2b1/HB1199.308_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback