IN HB1198 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 113
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Public safety matters. Designates an Indiana first responder to include the following employees and volunteers of state and local public safety agencies: (1) Law enforcement officers. (2) Firefighters, including volunteer firefighters. (3) Corrections officers. (4) Public safety telecommunicators. (5) Providers of emergency medical services. (6) Providers of emergency management services. (7) Any other individuals whose duties in serving a public safety agency include rapid emergency response. Provides that the designation of an individual as an Indiana first responder does not affect an individual's terms of employment or volunteer service with the public safety agency. Provides that a certified emergency medical technician or a licensed paramedic is not liable for transporting any person to an appropriate health care facility when the emergency medical technician or the licensed paramedic makes a good faith judgment that the emergency patient or the emergency patient's primary caregiver lacks the capacity to make an informed decision about the patient's: (1) safety; or (2) need for medical attention; and the emergency patient is reasonably likely to suffer disability or death without the medical intervention available at the facility.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public safety matters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 113
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-03SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-03HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-02-18SenateReturned to the House without amendments
2020-02-17SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-17SenateSenator Crider added as second sponsor
2020-02-17SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 206: yeas 49, nays 0
2020-02-13SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-11SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseRepresentative Klinker added as coauthor
2020-01-28HouseRule 105.1 suspended
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Glick
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 92: yeas 98, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseRepresentative Macer added as coauthor
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2020-01-13HouseCoauthored by Representatives Frye R and Bacon
2020-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Abbott

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1198/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/7/f/e/17fe8b92/HB1198.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/d/d/d/adddf663/HB1198.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/8/7/6/9876577f/HB1198.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/1/4/3/81433bcb/HB1198.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/b/6/deb6a468/HB1198.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/0/8/e/f08e1988/HB1198.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/9/f/9/69f99250/HB1198.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/4/5/0/54500d0e/HB1198.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/a/f/16afd424/HB1198.92_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/c/c/4/1cc49c48/HB1198.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/0/3/b903fe7a/HB1198.206_S.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback