IN HB1197 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-25 - First Reading: Referred to committee on Homeland Security & Transportation
Pending: Senate Homeland Security & Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

First responder tactical training. Requires the department of homeland security (department) to develop core curriculum requirements and standards for tactical emergency casualty care training programs (TECC programs) for: full-time firefighters, law enforcement officers, emergency medical technicians, advanced emergency medical technicians, and paramedics (first responders). Requires first responders to successfully complete an eight hour basic level TECC program conducted: (1) as part of the first responder's basic training, if basic training is completed after December 31, 2017; or (2) before July 1, 2020, if the officer completes basic training before January 1, 2018. Allows the department to accredit the TECC programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

First responder tactical training. Requires the department of homeland security (department) to develop core curriculum requirements and standards for tactical emergency casualty care training programs (TECC programs) for: full-time firefighters, law enforcement officers, emergency medical technicians, advanced emergency medical technicians, and paramedics (first responders). Requires first responders to successfully complete an eight hour basic level TECC program conducted: (1) as part of the first responder's basic training, if basic training is completed after December 31, 2017; or (2) before July 1, 2020, if the officer completes basic training before January 1, 2018. Allows the department to accredit the TECC programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-23 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-25SenateFirst Reading: Referred to committee on Homeland Security & Transportation
2015-02-24HouseReferred to the Senate
2015-02-23HouseSenator Arnold added as third sponsor
2015-02-23HouseSenator Charbonneau added as second sponsor
2015-02-23HouseSenator Eckerty added as sponsor
2015-02-23HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 195: yeas 96, nays 0
2015-02-19HouseAmendment #1 (Price) prevailed; voice vote
2015-02-19HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2015-02-17HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2015-02-12HouseRepresentative Macer added as coauthor
2015-01-12HouseFirst Reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2015-01-12HouseAuthored by Representative McNamara
2015-01-12HouseCoauthored by Representatives Bacon and Zent

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback