IN HB1196 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-10 - Public Law 73
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Homeowners associations and solar power. Provides that: (1) a homeowners association may require certain screening and preapproval procedures before an owner of a dwelling unit may install a solar energy system; and (2) a homeowners association may prohibit the installation, use, or removal of a solar energy system under certain circumstances.
Title
Homeowners associations and solar power.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Speedy [R] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] | Rep. Zach Payne [R] | Rep. Carey Hamilton [D] |
Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-01 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 84 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 82 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Public Law 73 |
2022-03-10 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2022-03-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2022-03-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 313: yeas 84, nays 7 |
2022-02-28 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 254: yeas 40, nays 8 |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-25 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2022-01-24 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Rogers and Freeman |
2022-01-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 64: yeas 82, nays 11 |
2022-01-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2022-01-13 | House | Representative Hamilton added as coauthor |
2022-01-13 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2022-01-12 | House | Representative Payne Z added as coauthor |
2022-01-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2022-01-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative Torr |
2022-01-06 | House | Authored by Representative Speedy |