IN HB1196 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Public Law 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Public Law 66
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
CHINS and delinquent child dual determination. Requires that in a child in need of services (CHINS) determination, a court shall determine if the child has been adjudicated as a delinquent child. Requires that in a delinquency determination, a court shall determine if the child is a child in need of services. Provides that if a child is a child in need of services and has been adjudicated as a delinquent child, a court may determine if the department of child services or the probation department of the court shall be the lead agency supervising the child. Creates procedures to determine
Title
CHINS and delinquent child dual determination. Requires that in a child in need of services (CHINS) determination, a court shall determine if the child has been adjudicated as a delinquent child. Requires that in a delinquency determination, a court shall determine if the child is a child in need of services. Provides that if a child is a child in need of services and has been adjudicated as a delinquent child, a court may determine if the department of child services or the probation department of the court shall be the lead agency supervising the child. Creates procedures to determine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Family & Children Services - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Committee on Family & Children Services - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-02 - House - House Committee on Judiciary - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | House | Public Law 66 |
2015-04-27 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2015-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 475: yeas 89, nays 0 |
2015-04-16 | House | Representative Sullivan added as coauthor |
2015-04-16 | House | Representatives Kirchhofer and Olthoff added as coauthor |
2015-04-16 | House | Representatives Errington, Macer, Klinker, Austin, Hale, Shackleford, Riecken added as coauthors |
2015-04-16 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-04-16 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-04-16 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2015-04-15 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senator Zakas added as cosponsor |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 346: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as cosponsor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senator Banks A added as cosponsor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senators Brown L, Leising, Tallian added as cosponsors |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Head) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senators Becker, Kruse, Breaux, Ford, Grooms, Rogers added as cosponsors |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as third sponsor |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading: Referred to committee on Family & Children Services |
2015-02-10 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2015-02-09 | House | Senator Bray added as second sponsor |
2015-02-09 | House | Senator Head added as sponsor |
2015-02-09 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 92: yeas 99, nays 0 |
2015-02-05 | House | Amendment #1 (McNamara) prevailed; voice vote |
2015-02-05 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2015-02-03 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2015-01-22 | House | Reassigned to committee on Judiciary |
2015-01-12 | House | First Reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2015-01-12 | House | Authored by Representative McNamara |
2015-01-12 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Mahan, Pierce, Lawson L |