IN HB1193 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the law enforcement, school policing, and youth work group (work group) to be staffed and administered by the criminal justice institute. Requires the work group to study and make specific recommendations concerning law enforcement, school policing, and youth. Requires each school corporation to annually submit a report to the department of education (department) concerning: (1) student arrests; (2) the use of school corporation police departments and security guards; and (3) whether the school corporation has an agreement with a law enforcement agency concerning arresting students on school corporation property. Requires the department of education to summarize the school corporations' reports and to submit the summary to the legislative council, the board for the coordination of programs serving vulnerable individuals, the education roundtable, and the criminal justice institute. Requires the department of education to post the reports on its web site.
Title
Juvenile, education, and law enforcement matters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Effective 07/01/2010 | |
2010-03-25 | Public Law 74 | |
2010-03-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2010-03-11 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2010-03-10 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | |
2010-03-08 | Signed by the Speaker | |
2010-03-01 | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 276: Yeas 91, Nays 1 | |
2010-02-18 | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-18 | Returned to the House with amendments | |
2010-02-18 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 181: Yeas 45 and Nays 3 | |
2010-02-15 | Senator Taylor added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-15 | Amendment 3 (Randolph), failed; Division of the Senate: Yeas 16, Nays 30 | |
2010-02-15 | Amendment 2 (Randolph), failed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-15 | Amendment 1 (Randolph), prevailed; Voice Vote | |
2010-02-15 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-02-11 | Senator Errington added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-11 | Senator Broden added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-11 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-02-01 | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor | |
2010-02-01 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-20 | Senate sponsor: Senator Bray | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-01-20 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 39: Yeas 95, Nays 1 | |
2010-01-19 | Representative Pond added as coauthor | |
2010-01-19 | Amendment 3 (Thompson), failed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-19 | Amendment 2 (Thompson), failed; Voice Vote | |
2010-01-19 | Amendment 4 (Clere), prevailed; Roll Call 30: Yeas 72, Nays 22 | |
2010-01-19 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-13 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-12 | Representatives Crawford and Pryor added as coauthors | |
2010-01-07 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2010-01-07 | Authored by Representative L. Lawson |