IN HB1187 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Passed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Public Law 109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Stolen valor. Makes it committing stolen valor, a Class A misdemeanor, for a person to knowingly or intentionally, with the intent to obtain money, property, or another benefit: (1) fraudulently represent himself or herself to be an active member or veteran of the armed forces of the United States; (2) use falsified military identification; or (3) fraudulently claim to be the recipient of certain military honors.
Title
Stolen valor. Makes it committing stolen valor, a Class A misdemeanor, for a person to knowingly or intentionally, with the intent to obtain money, property, or another benefit: (1) fraudulently represent himself or herself to be an active member or veteran of the armed forces of the United States; (2) use falsified military identification; or (3) fraudulently claim to be the recipient of certain military honors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Public Law 109 |
2016-03-22 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senator Brown L added as cosponsor |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senator Miller, Pat added as cosponsor |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 194: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senators Young, M., Charbonneau, Tomes, Steele added as cosponsors |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senator Kenley added as third sponsor |
2016-02-08 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections & Criminal Law |
2016-02-03 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-02-02 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Glick and Tallian |
2016-02-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 138: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2016-02-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-01-26 | House | Representative Macer added as coauthor |
2016-01-21 | House | Representative Arnold added as coauthor |
2016-01-13 | House | Representative Zent added as coauthor |
2016-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2016-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Moseley |