IN HB1186 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 147
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 147
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporation of towns.
Title
Incorporation of towns.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-04 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 147 |
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 540: yeas 82, nays 0 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Senator Buck added as cosponsor |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 374: yeas 48 and nays 0 |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as cosponsor |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-02-04 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Bray |
2013-02-04 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2013-02-04 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 57: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2013-01-31 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-01-28 | House | Representative Riecken added as coauthor |
2013-01-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-01-10 | House | Coauthored by Representatives Frizzell and Burton |
2013-01-10 | House | Authored by Representative Price |