IN HB1186 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allows a city or town that has not established a city or town court or an ordinance violations bureau to enter into an interlocal agreement with a city, town, or other municipal corporation that has established: (1) a city or town court; or (2) an ordinance violations bureau; to hear and dispose of ordinance violations that would otherwise come under the jurisdiction of a city or town court or an ordinance violations bureau established by the city or town.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interlocal agreements concerning courts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 55
2010-03-12 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-08 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-01 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-02-25 Signed by the Speaker
2010-02-23 Returned to the House without amendments
2010-02-23 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 207: Yeas 50 and Nays 0
2010-02-22 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-18 Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
2010-02-18 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-02-11 Senator Lanane added as cosponsor
2010-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
2010-01-25 Senate sponsors: Senators Bray, Buck and Kenley
2010-01-25 Referred to the Senate
2010-01-25 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 50: Yeas 95, Nays 0
2010-01-21 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-19 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-07 First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
2010-01-07 Coauthored by Representative Pierce
2010-01-07 Authored by Representative Saunders

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback