IN HB1183 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-25 - Sections 5 through 10 effective 07/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Places restrictions on agreements by property owners for location, delivery, recovery, or assistance in the recovery of money deposited in the tax sale surplus fund. Provides that the tax sale property list may be certified on or after January 1 and not later than 51 days after the first tax payment due date. Allows a county to recover its costs of sale of certain certificates of sale. Requires court approval of certain claims against the tax sale surplus fund. Allows the county executive to assign a certificate of sale with respect to real property to any political subdivision, and provides that the period of redemption of the real property is 120 days after the assignment. Establishes procedures to account for funds if a tax sale is declared invalid. Allows a sheriff's sale to proceed only if the tax sale redemption amount and outstanding property taxes, special assessments, penalties, and interest are paid. Requires notice to a tax sale purchaser of certain actions proposed with respect to the property under the unsafe building statute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax sale surplus fund agreements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-03-25 Sections 5 through 10 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Section 4 effective 03/17/2010
2010-03-25 Sections 2 through 3 effective 07/01/2010
2010-03-25 Section 1 effective 03/17/2010
2010-03-25 Public Law 73
2010-03-17 Signed by the Governor
2010-03-11 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-03-10 Signed by the President Pro Tempore
2010-03-08 Signed by the Speaker
2010-03-01 House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 275: Yeas 92, Nays 0
2010-02-23 Returned to the House with amendments
2010-02-23 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 206: Yeas 50 and Nays 0
2010-02-22 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-02-18 Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
2010-02-01 First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
2010-01-26 Cosponsor: Senator Taylor
2010-01-26 Senate sponsors: Senators Dillon, Randolph and Broden
2010-01-26 Referred to the Senate
2010-01-26 Third reading: passed; Roll Call 76: Yeas 97, Nays 0
2010-01-25 Second reading: ordered engrossed
2010-01-21 Representative Cherry added as coauthor
2010-01-20 Committee report: do pass, adopted
2010-01-13 Representative Moseley added as coauthor
2010-01-12 Representative Tyler added as coauthor
2010-01-07 First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
2010-01-07 Authored by Representative Bartlett

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback