IN HB1182 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 112
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

HIV, fatality reviews, and syringe exchange programs. Removes acquired immune deficiency syndrome (AIDS) from the statutory definition of "exposure risk disease". Replaces the term "AIDS" with the term "human immunodeficiency virus (HIV)" where appropriate. Replaces the term "carrier" with the term "individual with a communicable disease" where appropriate. Replaces the term "danger" with the term "risk" where appropriate. Replaces the term "spread" with the term "transmission" where appropriate. Replaces the term "HIV antibody" with "human immunodeficiency virus (HIV)" where appropriate. Requires the state department of health (department) to specify, in any literature provided to children and young adults concerning HIV, that abstinence is the best way to prevent the transmission of HIV as a result of sexual activity. Provides that a physician or the authorized representative of a physician may not order an HIV test unless the physician or the authorized representative of a physician: (1) informs the patient of the test orally or in writing; (2) provides the patient with an explanation of the test orally, in writing, by video, or by a combination of these methods; and (3) informs the patient orally or in writing of the patient's right to ask questions and to refuse the test. Requires the information to be communicated to the patient in a language or manner that the patient understands. Requires a physician or an authorized representative of the physician to inform a patient of the counseling services and treatment options available to the patient if an HIV test indicates that the patient is HIV positive. Requires a patient to be notified of their right to a: (1) hearing; and (2) counsel; in certain situations involving a court ordered HIV test. Specifies that the use of antiretroviral drugs and other medical interventions may lessen the likelihood of transmitting HIV to a child during childbirth. (Current law states that birth by caesarean section may lessen the likelihood of transmitting HIV to a child during childbirth). Provides that the requirement to dispose of semen that contains the HIV antibody does not apply if the semen is used according to safer conception practices endorsed by the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention or other generally accepted medical experts. Revises the definition of "health care provider". Provides that a patient is considered to have consented to: (1) testing for the presence of a dangerous communicable disease of a type that has been epidemiologically demonstrated to be transmittable by an exposure of the kind experienced by the affected health care provider; and (2) the release of testing results to a medical director or an affected physician in the event of an exposure; if the patient is unable to consent to testing or the release of test results due to physical or mental incapacity. Allows a health care provider or a health care provider's employer to petition a court for an order requiring a patient to provide a blood or bodily fluid specimen in certain instances. Allows a health care provider, a health care provider's employer, or the state department of health to request certain test results when a patient is a witness, bystander, or victim of alleged criminal activity in certain instances. Provides that a health care provider may request a notification concerning exposure to certain communicable diseases in certain instances. Allows a health care provider to designate a physician to receive certain test results following a possible exposure to certain communicable diseases. Requires a health care provider to be notified of an exposure to certain communicable diseases not later than 48 hours after certain notifications have been issued. Requires a health care provider to be provided with: (1) medically necessary treatment; and (2) counseling; following an exposure to certain communicable diseases. Requires a suicide and overdose fatality review team (SOFR team) to review certain suicide and overdose fatalities. Allows a SOFR team to make recommendations concerning the prevention of suicide and overdose fatalities. Specifies membership, record keeping, and data entry requirements for SOFR teams. Renumbers the article concerning suicide and overdose fatality teams for purposes of conflict resolution. Requires a syringe exchange program to: (1) provide testing for communicable diseases and provide services or a referral for services if the individual tests positive; and (2) establish a referral process for program participants in need of information or education concerning communicable diseases or health care. Requires the state department of health to include certain information concerning syringe exchange programs in the report to the general assembly before November 1, 2020. Extends the expiration date for certain syringe exchange programs from July 1, 2021, to July 1, 2022. Defines certain terms. Makes conforming amendments and technical corrections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HIV, fatality reviews, and syringe exchange programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 78 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 112
2020-03-18HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-12SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-10HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-05HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 321: yeas 78, nays 7
2020-03-04HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-03-04SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-03-03SenateSenator Merritt added as cosponsor
2020-03-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 297: yeas 36, nays 14
2020-03-02SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-03-02SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-27SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-11SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseCosponsor: Senator Breaux
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Becker, Grooms, Crider
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 90: yeas 98, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseAmendment #1 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseRepresentatives Cook, Barrett, Fleming added as coauthors
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2020-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Clere

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1182/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/0/5/6/2056f9e9/HB1182.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/e/3/2/fe32ef5f/HB1182.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/d/4/74d4edf2/HB1182.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/e/5/f5e59e0d/HB1182.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/d/8/25d80f45/HB1182.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/7/9/e/c79e5069/HB1182.03.ENGH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/1/a/d41a2658/HB1182.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/7/4/da74718f/HB1182.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/d/0/4/9d04b020/HB1182.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/9/5/7/b9571441/HB1182.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/a/0/0/6a00cf2a/HB1182.90_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/2/f/1/62f1a123/HB1182.03.ENGH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/8/c/9/e8c9d6f6/HB1182.297_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/b/c/2/cbc274c3/HB1182.321_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback