IN HB1182 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 164
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Physician order for scope of treatment forms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physician order for scope of treatment forms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-25 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-05 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-13HousePublic Law 164
2013-05-07HouseSigned by the Governor
2013-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2013-04-26SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2013-04-25HouseSigned by the Speaker
2013-04-25HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 592: yeas 95, nays 0
2013-03-19SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2013-03-19SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 287: yeas 48 and nays 1
2013-03-14SenateSenator Breaux added as cosponsor
2013-03-12SenateSenator Mishler added as second sponsor
2013-03-12SenateSenator Holdman added as third sponsor
2013-03-12SenateAmendment 2 (Pat Miller), prevailed; voice vote
2013-03-12SenateAmendment 1 (Taylor), rejected; Division of the Senate: yeas 12, nays 30
2013-03-12SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-03-07SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-02-25SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2013-02-05HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Pat Miller
2013-02-05HouseReferred to the Senate
2013-02-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 74: yeas 99, nays 0
2013-02-04HouseAmendment 1 (Clere), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-04HouseAmendment 2 (T. Brown), prevailed; voice vote
2013-02-04HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2013-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2013-01-17HouseRepresentatives C. Brown and Shackleford added as coauthors
2013-01-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2013-01-10HouseCoauthored by Representative Clere
2013-01-10HouseAuthored by Representative T. Brown

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback