IN HB1182 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation & Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-08 - First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation & Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Homeland Security, Transportation, and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning December 2010, requires the Indiana department of transportation (INDOT) to report annually in an electronic format to the general assembly on the steps taken and progress made by INDOT in developing and implementing complete streets guidelines at the state level.
Title
Complete streets guidelines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation & Veterans Affairs | |
2010-02-02 | Representatives Barnes and Soliday added as coauthors | |
2010-02-02 | Senate sponsors: Senators Merritt and Arnold | |
2010-02-02 | Referred to the Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 134: Yeas 91, Nays 4 | |
2010-02-01 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2010-01-28 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | |
2010-01-14 | Representative Dvorak added as coauthor | |
2010-01-07 | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation | |
2010-01-07 | Authored by Representative Dembowski |