IN HB1181 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Gift certificates and store gift cards. Provides that, after June 30, 2020, a person shall not sell or issue to an Indiana consumer any gift certificate or store gift card with an expiration date unless certain conditions are met. Provides that, with respect to a gift certificate or a store gift card that is sold or issued to an Indiana consumer after June 30, 2020, if at any time after the gift certificate or store gift card is issued or sold: (1) the merchant for which the gift certificate or store gift card was originally sold or issued: (A) for any reason ceases to do business in Indiana; or (B) for any reason: (i) substantially changes; or (ii) ceases to offer; the types of goods or services that were offered to consumers at the time the gift certificate or store gift card was originally sold or issued; and (2) any expiration date: (A) authorized under the bill's provisions; and (B) applicable to the gift certificate or store gift card (or to the underlying funds associated with either) has not elapsed; the merchant for which the gift certificate or store gift card was originally sold or issued shall, upon the request of an Indiana consumer who is the rightful holder of the gift certificate or store gift card, promptly refund to the holder the balance of the underlying funds or provide the holder with the remaining balance in some other manner. Provides that a person that violates the bill's provisions: (1) commits a deceptive act that is actionable by an aggrieved consumer and the attorney general under the deceptive consumer sales act; and (2) is subject to the penalties and remedies set forth in the deceptive consumer sales act. Authorizes the attorney general to adopt rules to implement these provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gift certificates and store gift cards.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseRepresentatives Macer and Lauer added as coauthors
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Koch and Buck
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 89: yeas 96, nays 1
2020-01-27HouseAmendment #1 (Cook) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-21HouseRepresentative Morris added as coauthor
2020-01-13HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
2020-01-13HouseAuthored by Representative Cook

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback