IN HB1181 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
Pending: Senate Insurance & Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Gift certificates and store gift cards. Provides that, after June 30, 2020, a person shall not sell or issue to an Indiana consumer any gift certificate or store gift card with an expiration date unless certain conditions are met. Provides that, with respect to a gift certificate or a store gift card that is sold or issued to an Indiana consumer after June 30, 2020, if at any time after the gift certificate or store gift card is issued or sold: (1) the merchant for which the gift certificate or store gift card was originally sold or issued: (A) for any reason ceases to do business in Indiana; or (B) for any reason: (i) substantially changes; or (ii) ceases to offer; the types of goods or services that were offered to consumers at the time the gift certificate or store gift card was originally sold or issued; and (2) any expiration date: (A) authorized under the bill's provisions; and (B) applicable to the gift certificate or store gift card (or to the underlying funds associated with either) has not elapsed; the merchant for which the gift certificate or store gift card was originally sold or issued shall, upon the request of an Indiana consumer who is the rightful holder of the gift certificate or store gift card, promptly refund to the holder the balance of the underlying funds or provide the holder with the remaining balance in some other manner. Provides that a person that violates the bill's provisions: (1) commits a deceptive act that is actionable by an aggrieved consumer and the attorney general under the deceptive consumer sales act; and (2) is subject to the penalties and remedies set forth in the deceptive consumer sales act. Authorizes the attorney general to adopt rules to implement these provisions.
Title
Gift certificates and store gift cards.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Cook [R] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Karlee Macer [D] | Rep. Ryan Lauer [R] |
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2020-02-05 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2020-01-28 | House | Representatives Macer and Lauer added as coauthors |
2020-01-28 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Koch and Buck |
2020-01-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 89: yeas 96, nays 1 |
2020-01-27 | House | Amendment #1 (Cook) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-27 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-21 | House | Representative Morris added as coauthor |
2020-01-13 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development |
2020-01-13 | House | Authored by Representative Cook |