IN HB1180 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 16 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Senate advisors appointed: Spartz and Ford J.D.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Pharmacy benefit managers. Requires a pharmacy benefit manager to obtain a license issued by the department of insurance (department). Specifies pharmacy benefit manager network and annual reporting requirements. Provides rulemaking authority for the department. Requires a health plan that denies prior authorization for certain prescription drugs to provide an alternative list of prescription drugs or alternative treatments covered by the health plan. Urges the legislative council to assign to an interim study committee the topic of regulation and practice of pharmacy benefit managers for study and recommendations during the 2019 interim of the general assembly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pharmacy benefit managers. Requires a pharmacy benefit manager to obtain a license issued by the department of insurance (department). Specifies pharmacy benefit manager network and annual reporting requirements. Provides rulemaking authority for the department. Requires a health plan that denies prior authorization for certain prescription drugs to provide an alternative list of prescription drugs or alternative treatments covered by the health plan. Urges the legislative council to assign to an interim study committee the topic of regulation and practice of pharmacy benefit managers for study and recommendations during the 2019 interim of the general assembly.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18SenateSenate advisors appointed: Spartz and Ford J.D.
2019-04-18SenateSenate conferees appointed: Holdman and Stoops
2019-04-18HouseHouse advisors appointed: Karickhoff, Davisson, Morris, Heine, Goodrich, Chyung and Hamilton
2019-04-18HouseHouse conferees appointed: Carbaugh and Austin
2019-04-17HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-17HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-16SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-16SenateSenator Grooms added as cosponsor
2019-04-16SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 480: yeas 47, nays 2
2019-04-15SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-15SenateAmendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
2019-04-15SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-04-15SenateSenator Spartz added as second sponsor
2019-04-11SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2019-02-20HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-19HouseRepresentative Davisson added as coauthor
2019-02-19HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Holdman
2019-02-19HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-14HouseRepresentatives Austin and Lehman added as coauthors
2019-02-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2019-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Carbaugh

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1180/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/9/f/a/e9fac559/HB1180.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/3/6/a/c36a23e3/HB1180.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/0/e/2/a0e2665a/HB1180.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/a/b/0/bab02305/HB1180.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/b/f/8/1bf8fd07/HB1180.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/b/c/4/7bc48319/HB1180.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/3/1/0331f8a0/HB1180.04.ENGS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/7/b/577b2f9b/HB1180.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/b/0/2/2b02128b/HB1180.213.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/a/2/4/0a24b81b/HB1180.02.COMH.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/9/d/a/09da1c39/HB1180.480.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback