IN HB1177 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Law 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-08 - Public Law 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Strategic plan on dementia. Requires the division of aging (division) to develop a strategic plan concerning dementia in Indiana. Requires the division to submit an annual report to the general assembly concerning the dementia strategic plan and the outcomes of implementing the dementia strategic plan.
Title
Strategic plan on dementia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-08 | House | Public Law 36 |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Returned to the House without amendments |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Senator Yoder added as cosponsor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 259: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senator Qaddoura added as cosponsor |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | Cosponsor: Senator Melton |
2021-02-22 | House | Senate sponsors: Senators Becker, Breaux, Ford Jon |
2021-02-22 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 226: yeas 91, nays 1 |
2021-02-17 | House | Representatives Manning, Jackson, Barrett added as coauthors |
2021-02-17 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2021-02-15 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2021-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2021-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Porter |