IN HB1177 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 129
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Township government issues. Requires a township to prepare a capital improvement plan for at least the ensuing three years if the balance in certain capital improvement funds in the preceding year exceeds both of the following: (1) 150% of the township's annual budget estimate. (2) $200,000. Prohibits the township from collecting property taxes for certain capital improvement funds in the ensuing year unless the township has adopted a capital improvement plan. Allows a township to make a one time transfer of an excess balance or part of an excess balance between township funds. Provides that the transfer may not be completed until after the township adopts a capital improvement plan, if the township is required to adopt a capital improvement plan. Requires the transfers must be completed not later than September 1, 2020. Provides that if an eligible municipality petitions an adjacent township to accept the transfer of the territory of the eligible municipality that is within the transferor township, the legislative body of the adjacent township must accept transfer of the territory of an eligible municipality within two years (instead of one year) after the legislative body receives the petition. Repeals a provision that prohibits the transfer of territory from taking effect in the year before a federal decennial census is conducted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Township government issues. Requires a township to prepare a capital improvement plan for at least the ensuing three years if the balance in certain capital improvement funds in the preceding year exceeds both of the following: (1) 150% of the township's annual budget estimate. (2) $200,000. Prohibits the township from collecting property taxes for certain capital improvement funds in the ensuing year unless the township has adopted a capital improvement plan. Allows a township to make a one time transfer of an excess balance or part of an excess balance between township funds. Provides that the transfer may not be completed until after the township adopts a capital improvement plan, if the township is required to adopt a capital improvement plan. Requires the transfers must be completed not later than September 1, 2020. Provides that if an eligible municipality petitions an adjacent township to accept the transfer of the territory of the eligible municipality that is within the transferor township, the legislative body of the adjacent township must accept transfer of the territory of an eligible municipality within two years (instead of one year) after the legislative body receives the petition. Repeals a provision that prohibits the transfer of territory from taking effect in the year before a federal decennial census is conducted.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House - House reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HousePublic Law 129
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-24SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-23HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-18HouseHouse reconsidered and concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 553: yeas 91, nays 1
2019-04-17HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-15SenateSenate advisors appointed: Buck and Lanane
2019-04-15SenateSenate conferees appointed: Niemeyer and Taylor G
2019-04-15HouseHouse advisors appointed: Mahan, Bacon, Abbott, Zent, Bartlett and Shackleford
2019-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Ziemke and Campbell
2019-04-11HouseHouse dissented from Senate amendments
2019-04-11HouseMotion to dissent filed
2019-04-10SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-09SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-09SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 422: yeas 45, nays 3
2019-04-08SenateSenator Kruse added as second sponsor
2019-04-08SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-04-04SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-02-19HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-18HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Niemeyer
2019-02-18HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 204: yeas 88, nays 9
2019-02-14HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-11HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-01-31HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-01-31HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-28HouseRepresentative Bacon added as coauthor
2019-01-10HouseReassigned to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
2019-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
2019-01-08HouseCoauthored by Representative Mahan
2019-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Ziemke

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1177/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/6/b/d76be540/HB1177.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/c/2/1/5c211964/HB1177.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/b/2/b8b2c8c2/HB1177.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/4/d/a/14da7bde/HB1177.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/6/1/1/16110b7e/HB1177.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/8/d/3/18d38f92/HB1177.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/a/b/88ab9adb/HB1177.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/a/e/8/fae8140a/HB1177.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/5/8/3/55830fa0/HB1177.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/3/f/a33fb809/HB1177.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/9/0/0/49008f11/HB1177.02.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/f/3/e/df3e7e51/HB1177.204.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/2/e/8/e2e87fe0/HB1177.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/8/2/7/8827a064/HB1177.422.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/8/6/5/c8655d43/HB1177.553.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback