IN HB1175 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Public Law 128
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Behavioral health professionals. Requires that the office of Medicaid policy and planning include a licensed clinical social worker, a licensed mental health counselor, a licensed clinical addiction counselor, and a licensed marriage and family therapist who meet certain qualifications as eligible providers for the supervision of a plan of treatment for a patient's outpatient mental health or substance abuse treatment services. Requires Medicaid reimbursement, upon approval from the United States Department of Health and Human Services, for: (1) clinical social workers; (2) marriage and family therapists; (3) mental health counselors; and (4) clinical addiction counselors; who work in federally-qualified health centers and rural health clinics.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Behavioral health professionals. Requires that the office of Medicaid policy and planning include a licensed clinical social worker, a licensed mental health counselor, a licensed clinical addiction counselor, and a licensed marriage and family therapist who meet certain qualifications as eligible providers for the supervision of a plan of treatment for a patient's outpatient mental health or substance abuse treatment services. Requires Medicaid reimbursement, upon approval from the United States Department of Health and Human Services, for: (1) clinical social workers; (2) marriage and family therapists; (3) mental health counselors; and (4) clinical addiction counselors; who work in federally-qualified health centers and rural health clinics.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HousePublic Law 128
2019-04-29HouseSigned by the Governor
2019-04-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-04-15SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2019-04-11HouseSigned by the Speaker
2019-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 459: yeas 93, nays 0
2019-04-09HouseMotion to concur filed
2019-04-03SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 372: yeas 48, nays 0
2019-04-01SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2019-04-01SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-03-28SenateSenator Melton added as cosponsor
2019-03-28SenateSenators Crider and Leising added as cosponsors
2019-03-28SenateSenator Becker added as second sponsor
2019-03-28SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2019-02-13HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-12HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau
2019-02-12HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 165: yeas 91, nays 0
2019-02-11HouseRepresentatives Kirchhofer, Shackleford, Manning added as coauthors
2019-02-11HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-07HouseCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2019-02-05HouseRepresentative Manning removed as coauthor
2019-01-28HouseRepresentative Manning added as coauthor
2019-01-24HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
2019-01-24HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2019-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Ziemke

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1175/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/8/b/e78b8025/HB1175.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/0/2/d/402db018/HB1175.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/c/5/fbc56ab9/HB1175.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/4/d/1e4d4902/HB1175.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/6/0/2/4/60245950/HB1175.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/c/a/c/fcaca5ea/HB1175.03.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/e/4/3/0e43c3f4/HB1175.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/2/1/d/221d77de/HB1175.04.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/d/6/6/0d665f28/HB1175.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/a/0/4/2a046468/HB1175.01.INTR.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/7/5/7/d75734ec/HB1175.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/b/4/f/fb4fa520/HB1175.165.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/f/f/32ffc7ad/HB1175.03.COMH.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/f/e/f/9fef6962/HB1175.372.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/f/f/a/2ffacae2/HB1175.459.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback