IN HB1173 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 42
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Indiana department of veterans' affairs. Requires the director of veterans' affairs to be a resident of Indiana for at least two cumulative years prior to being appointed. Requires certain veterans' affairs service officers (officers) to be a resident of Indiana or to become a resident of Indiana not more than six months after the officer's start date and to: (1) be an honorably discharged veteran with at least six months of active service in the armed forces of the United States; or (2) be a service officer assistant (assistant) with at least two years of experience. Requires an assistant to be a resident of Indiana or become a resident of Indiana not later than six months after the assistant's start date and to: (1) satisfy certain officer eligibility requirements; or (2) be the spouse, surviving spouse, parent, or child of an officer that satisfies certain eligibility requirements. Allows county recorders to keep an electronic record of discharges. Requires the department of veterans' affairs (department) to develop a process concerning the release of discharge records by county recorders. Provides the department with rulemaking authority, including emergency rulemaking authority, for the purpose of developing and implementing a discharge record process. Revises certain program eligibility provisions to reference participants more precisely. Repeals statutes related to unused programs. Makes technical changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Indiana department of veterans' affairs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 59 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 42
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-05HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 311: yeas 59, nays 28
2020-03-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-02-26SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-02-25SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 244: yeas 44, nays 0
2020-02-24SenateAmendment #2 (Tomes) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-24SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-20SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-20SenateSenator Crider added as second sponsor
2020-02-18SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military
2020-01-22HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-21HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Tomes
2020-01-21HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 38: yeas 97, nays 0
2020-01-16HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-14HouseRepresentatives Judy, Zent, Macer added as coauthors
2020-01-14HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety
2020-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Frye R

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1173/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/f/e/c/1fec09dc/HB1173.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/2/5/0/32500766/HB1173.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/2/b/f/52bfa4af/HB1173.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/2/e/c/82eca3de/HB1173.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/3/c/e/03cea482/HB1173.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/e/0/1/1e0111ec/HB1173.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/0/5/1/c051fe7b/HB1173.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/d/e/4/dde47059/HB1173.04.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/7/c/6/57c6581c/HB1173.05.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/6/9/7/2697857f/HB1173.01.INTR.02.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/8/1/a/281ae28e/HB1173.38_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/7/3/b/273b6770/HB1173.02.COMH.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/6/d/3/c6d39166/HB1173.244_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/d/7/8/3d78565e/HB1173.311_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback