IN HB1172 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
Pending: Senate Education and Career Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Virtual education. Requires a school corporation to establish and implement an annual onboarding process and orientation for prospective students of a school corporation's virtual education program. Requires a virtual charter school to establish and implement an annual onboarding process and orientation for students newly enrolled in the virtual charter school. Provides that, after June 30, 2019, a governing body of a school corporation or the mayor of Indianapolis may not authorize a virtual charter school. Requires a virtual charter school authorizer to review and monitor certain practices of the virtual charter school. Provides that a student who does not participate in a school corporation's virtual program before July 1, 2019, must complete the onboarding process and orientation established by the school corporation before the student may participate in the school corporation's virtual education program. Provides that, if at least 30% of the total number of students enrolled in a school corporation participate in the school corporation's virtual education program, the school corporation shall establish a dedicated virtual education school. Requires a student in a virtual education program or virtual charter school to be an Indiana resident. Provides that if a student of a virtual education program or a virtual charter school accumulates the number of unexcused absences sufficient to result in the student's classification as a habitual truant, the student must be withdrawn from the virtual education program or virtual charter school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Virtual education. Requires a school corporation to establish and implement an annual onboarding process and orientation for prospective students of a school corporation's virtual education program. Requires a virtual charter school to establish and implement an annual onboarding process and orientation for students newly enrolled in the virtual charter school. Provides that, after June 30, 2019, a governing body of a school corporation or the mayor of Indianapolis may not authorize a virtual charter school. Requires a virtual charter school authorizer to review and monitor certain practices of the virtual charter school. Provides that a student who does not participate in a school corporation's virtual program before July 1, 2019, must complete the onboarding process and orientation established by the school corporation before the student may participate in the school corporation's virtual education program. Provides that, if at least 30% of the total number of students enrolled in a school corporation participate in the school corporation's virtual education program, the school corporation shall establish a dedicated virtual education school. Requires a student in a virtual education program or virtual charter school to be an Indiana resident. Provides that if a student of a virtual education program or a virtual charter school accumulates the number of unexcused absences sufficient to result in the student's classification as a habitual truant, the student must be withdrawn from the virtual education program or virtual charter school.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment #13 (Smith V) prevailed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment #11 (Smith V) prevailed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment #12 (Smith V) prevailed (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment #3 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 31 N: 64 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-01-31 - House - Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed (Y: 30 N: 65 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-01-16 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
2019-02-06HouseReferred to the Senate
2019-02-05HouseSenate sponsors: Senators Raatz and Melton
2019-02-05HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 100: yeas 92, nays 3
2019-02-04HouseRepresentatives Prescott and Smith, V. added as coauthors
2019-01-31HouseAmendment #13 (Smith V) prevailed; Roll Call 72: yeas 92, nays 0
2019-01-31HouseAmendment #11 (Smith V) prevailed; Roll Call 71: yeas 94, nays 0
2019-01-31HouseAmendment #12 (Smith V) prevailed; Roll Call 70: yeas 92, nays 0
2019-01-31HouseAmendment #3 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 69: yeas 31, nays 64
2019-01-31HouseAmendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 68: yeas 30, nays 65
2019-01-31HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2019-01-22HouseRepresentative Goodrich added as coauthor
2019-01-17HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-01-08HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Education
2019-01-08HouseAuthored by Representative Behning

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2019/bills/house/1172/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/9/a/3a9a09de/HB1172.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/9/1/4/9914dccf/HB1172.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/a/3/7/da378eca/HB1172.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/e/7/f/b/e7fb9d69/HB1172.03.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/5/2/9/b52980dd/HB1172.01.INTR.00.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/c/b/a3cb6b81/HB1172.68.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/1/2/2/4/122410dd/HB1172.69.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/3/7/e/437e82f0/HB1172.70.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/1/b/4/c1b42ccb/HB1172.71.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/5/f/8/85f82209/HB1172.72.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/f/5/7/e/f57e6c73/HB1172.100.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback