IN HB1172 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 158
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-23 - Public Law 158
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cosmetology. Adds to the definition of "cosmetology": (1) removing superfluous hair from the body by the use of depilatories, waxing, or tweezers; (2) shaving or trimming beards and mustaches; and (3) giving facials, applying makeup, and giving skin care. Requires the state board of cosmetology and barber examiners (board) to adopt rules specifying whether the definition of "cosmetology" includes the use of a straight razor. Makes changes to the definition of "manicuring". Defines "pedicuring" as cleaning, dressing, polishing, sculpting, tipping, or wrapping the nails of a person's foot. Makes certain changes to the requirements to obtain a beauty culture school
Title
Cosmetology. Adds to the definition of "cosmetology": (1) removing superfluous hair from the body by the use of depilatories, waxing, or tweezers; (2) shaving or trimming beards and mustaches; and (3) giving facials, applying makeup, and giving skin care. Requires the state board of cosmetology and barber examiners (board) to adopt rules specifying whether the definition of "cosmetology" includes the use of a straight razor. Makes changes to the definition of "manicuring". Defines "pedicuring" as cleaning, dressing, polishing, sculpting, tipping, or wrapping the nails of a person's foot. Makes certain changes to the requirements to obtain a beauty culture school
Sponsors
Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. Terry Goodin [D] | Sen. Philip Boots [R] |
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 65 N: 27 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-01-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Public Law 158 |
2016-03-23 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2016-03-09 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2016-03-03 | House | Motion to concur filed |
2016-03-03 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 358: yeas 71, nays 22 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Returned to the House with amendments |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as cosponsor |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 269: yeas 41, nays 9 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second sponsor |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce & Technology |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as cosponsor |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred to the Senate |
2016-01-19 | House | Representatives Bacon and Goodin added as coauthors |
2016-01-19 | House | Representative Goodin removed as coauthor |
2016-01-19 | House | Senate sponsor: Senator Boots |
2016-01-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 16: yeas 65, nays 27 |
2016-01-14 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2016-01-12 | House | Representative Goodin added as coauthor |
2016-01-12 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2016-01-07 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2016-01-07 | House | Authored by Representative Schaibley |